WebbRichard W. Fisher served as the twelfth president of the Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas from April 4, 2005, to March 19, 2015. Fisher attended the US Naval Academy from 1967 to 1969, graduated with honors from Harvard University with a degree in economics in 1971, studied Latin American politics at Hertford College, Oxford from 1972 to 1973, and … Webb25 mars 2015 · Ex-central banker Fisher speaks out on US Fed, QE. Jame DiBiasio. Mar 25, 2015. Likening index-hugging investors to wildebeests, Richard Fisher, just-retired head of the Dallas Federal Reserve, says the central bank won’t get in the way of the lions. Richard Fisher retired last week after 10 years as the president and CEO of the Federal ...
Stock picks of the Federal Reserve presidents - Feb. 2, 2012
Webb21 dec. 2004 · Richard W. Fisher will become President of the Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas effective April 4, 2005. The appointment of Mr. Fisher was announced today by Ray L. Hunt, Chairman of the Bank's Board of Directors. Mr. Fisher will succeed Robert D. McTeer, Jr., who resigned November 4, 2004, to become chancellor of the Texas A&M … Webb12 apr. 2024 · Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas Lorie K. Logan took office on August 22, 2024, as the 14th president and chief executive officer of the 11th District, Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas. Read more Bank Location 2200 North Pearl Street Dallas, TX 75201 (214) 922-6000 Visitor Information Tours Head office at Dallas, Texas. nss ipcw
Dallas Fed appoints first female president to succeed Rob Kaplan
Webb20 mars 2015 · Richard W. Fisher, who stepped down on Thursday after a decade as president of the Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas, is best known not so much for what he said as for the way he said it.... Webb6 jan. 2006 · Speech by Richard W. Fisher, President and CEO (2005–2015) Coping with Globalization's Impact on Monetary Policy Remarks for the National Association for … WebbHe represented the Eleventh Federal Reserve District on the Federal Open Market Committee in the formulation of US monetary policy and oversaw the 1,200 employees … nih innovations for healthy living